02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/13/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
04/29/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 678.) | |||
04/20/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |