|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 11. Page 4644.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 53. Noes 20. Page 6107.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
02/18/2010
|
To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 2707.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/14/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 4. Noes 2. Page 2673.)
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Set for hearing January 11.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|