08/06/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 48, Statutes of 2009. | |||
08/05/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/27/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2448.) To Senate. | |||
07/06/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
07/02/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |||
05/11/2009 | To Com. on V.A. | |||
04/20/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/20/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 544.) To Assembly. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
04/15/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 500.) | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |