02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/24/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. (Ayes 6. Noes 3. Page 340.) Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
03/18/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
03/12/2009 | Set for hearing March 24. | |||
03/09/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Coms. on N.R. & W. and E., U. & C. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Coms. on E., U. & C. and N.R. & W. | |||
01/07/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 6. | |||
01/06/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |