07/20/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 19, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/20/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
07/20/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m. | |||
07/09/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
07/09/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 75. Noes 0. Page 2442.) To Senate. | |||
06/24/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 22.) | |||
05/21/2009 | To Com. on NAT. RES. | |||
04/16/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
04/16/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 4. Page 519.) To Assembly. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 479.) | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |