07/02/2009 | Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 13, Statutes of 2009. | |||
07/02/2009 | Approved by Governor. | |||
06/29/2009 | Enrolled. To Governor at 4:30 p.m. | |||
06/25/2009 | In Senate. To enrollment. | |||
06/25/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 0. Page 2261.) To Senate. | |||
06/18/2009 | Read second time. To third reading. | |||
06/17/2009 | From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 17.) | |||
06/02/2009 | To Com. on L. GOV. | |||
05/18/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/18/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 33. Noes 0. Page 926.) To Assembly. | |||
05/13/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file. | |||
05/12/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/11/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 809.) | |||
03/16/2009 | Set for hearing May 6. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |