|
01/25/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 797.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|