|
09/28/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 407, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 21. Noes 16. Page 5008.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 6. Noes 2. Page 4807.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
Set for hearing August 23.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 4627.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/18/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 43. Noes 31. Page 6338.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/22/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 17. Page 1108.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1071.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 499.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|