02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/13/2010 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 1. Noes 7. Page 2664.) | |||
01/05/2010 | Set for hearing January 13. | |||
01/04/2010 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
12/18/2009 | Set for hearing January 6. | |||
12/16/2009 | Set for hearing January 5. | |||
12/15/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C. | |||
05/05/2009 | Set, first hearing. Testimony taken. Further hearing to be set. | |||
04/13/2009 | Set for hearing May 5. | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on E., U. & C. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |