02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/13/2010 | Set, second hearing. Failed passage in committee. (Ayes 2. Noes 5. Page 2665.) | |||
12/17/2009 | Set for hearing January 12. | |||
04/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee without recommendation. | |||
04/21/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |