|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 184, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2281.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 0. Page 2853.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 12. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 796.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 656.)
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 479.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|