|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 335, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2130.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2763.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/04/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 890.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 480.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|