|
08/31/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 12.)
|
|
|
|
08/04/2010
|
Set, second hearing. Placed on APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. Re-referred to Coms. on ED. and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 11.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. Read third time. Amended. (Page 3418.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3319.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on U. & C. (Heard in committee on September 9.)
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 3056.)
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3044.) Re-referred to Coms. on NAT. RES. and U. & C. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Krekorian.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
From Consent Calendar to third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 623.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 398.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|