|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 308, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 4656.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 65. Noes 9. Page 6246.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on H. & C.D. (Heard in Committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/27/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
04/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
02/25/2010
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 2706.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2687.)
|
|
|
|
01/15/2010
|
Set for hearing January 19.
|
|
|
|
01/13/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 0. Page 2665.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
01/08/2010
|
Set for hearing January 12.
|
|
|
|
01/07/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
12/17/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on RLS.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|