|
09/30/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 12. Page 5037.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 5. Page 6830.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/25/2010
|
Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to Com. on RLS. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6367.) To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
07/29/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
06/28/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
07/24/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 4.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 29.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 32. Noes 5. Page 1137.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 9. Noes 4. Page 1026.)
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 609.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|