|
01/27/2010
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Ma.
|
|
|
|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
From Conference Committee: Be adopted. (Ayes 8: Senators Steinberg, Florez, Padilla, and Pavley, Assembly Members Bass, Huffman, Caballero, and Solorio. Noes. 0. Page 2352.)
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Senate appoints Conference Committee: Senators Steinberg, Aanestad, Cogdill, Florez, Huff, Padilla, and Pavley. Assembly appoints Conference Committee: Assembly Members Bass, Caballero, Fuller, Huffman, Jeffries, Nielsen, and Solorio.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
Joint Rules 28, 28.1, and 29.5 suspended in the Senate. (Ayes 28. Noes 0. Page 2005.) Joint Rules 28, 28.1, 29, and 29.5 suspended in the Assembly. (Ayes 58. Noes 0. Page 2827.)
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 0. Noes 36. Page 1757.)
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 45. Noes 23. Page 2489.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. (Ayes 46. Noes 27. Page 2433.) Placed on second reading file. Read second time. Amended. To third reading. (Ayes 42. Noes 27. Page 2441.)
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Further hearing to be set.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. (Corrected June 25.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on W.,P. & W.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 10. Page 1184.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1071.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 479.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on N.R. & W.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|