02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
06/30/2009 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
06/29/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
04/30/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 683.) | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
04/17/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
04/16/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on N.R. & W. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |