02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/13/2009 | Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
05/05/2009 | Set for hearing May 13. | |||
04/29/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 10. Noes 0. Page 583.) | |||
03/25/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Coms. on E., U. & C. and REV. & TAX. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |