02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/05/2010 | Set, first hearing. Failed passage in committee. | |||
12/17/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., R., & C.A. | |||
12/11/2009 | Set for hearing January 5. | |||
04/20/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/02/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on E., R. & C.A. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |