LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB471
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB471
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB471
Compare Versions
SB471 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB471 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB471 Amended September 4, 2009
SB471 Amended August 31, 2009
SB471 Amended July 15, 2009
SB471 Amended May 28, 2009
SB471 Amended May 6, 2009
SB471 Amended April 22, 2009
SB471 Amended April 2, 2009
SB471 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB471 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB471 Enrolled September 11, 2009
SB471 Amended September 4, 2009
SB471 Amended August 31, 2009
SB471 Amended July 15, 2009
SB471 Amended May 28, 2009
SB471 Amended May 6, 2009
SB471 Amended April 22, 2009
SB471 Amended April 2, 2009
SB471 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare