|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 51, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
In Senate. To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 69. Noes 6. Page 2486.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 14. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
To Com. on B. & P.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 886.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 581.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on B., P. & E.D.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|