06/22/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
05/28/2009 | To Coms. on NAT. RES. and JUD. | |||
05/11/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/11/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 827.) To Assembly. | |||
05/06/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
04/30/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
04/29/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 0. Page 679.) | |||
04/23/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on EQ. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |