|
08/13/2010
|
Set, final hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2010
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on L. & E. (Heard in committee on May 6.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on H. & C.D.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 890.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 610.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|