|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 196, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 9 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 2130.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 74. Noes 0. Page 2761.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
08/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 19.)
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. pursuant to Joint Rule 10.5.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on L. & E.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 977.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 876.)
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Set for hearing May 13.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on L. & I.R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|