02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/12/2009 | Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
05/07/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
05/04/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/24/2009 | Set for hearing May 5. | |||
04/02/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
04/02/2009 | Set for hearing April 14. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |