08/20/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on RULES. Action rescinded whereby the bill was re-referred to committee. Read third time. Amended. (Page 2668.) Re-referred to Com. on RULES. | |||
08/17/2009 | Read third time. Amended. (Page 2612.) To third reading. Action rescinded whereby amendments were adopted. | |||
07/09/2009 | From Consent Calendar to third reading. | |||
07/07/2009 | Read second time. To Consent Calendar. | |||
07/06/2009 | Read second time. Amended. To second reading. | |||
07/02/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.) | |||
06/23/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
06/08/2009 | To Com. on JUD. | |||
05/21/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
05/21/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 978.) To Assembly. | |||
05/13/2009 | From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 5. Noes 0. Page 875.) | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 12. | |||
04/13/2009 | Re-referred to Com. on JUD. | |||
04/02/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |