California 2009-2010 Regular Session

California Senate Bill SB488 Drafts & Versions

Introduced

Bill February 26, 2009

Enrolled

Bill September 10, 2009

Chaptered

Bill October 11, 2009

Amended

Bill August 31, 2009
Bill August 17, 2009
Bill July 15, 2009
Bill June 15, 2009
Bill May 28, 2009
Bill May 20, 2009
Bill May 5, 2009
Bill April 14, 2009