02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/06/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
05/13/2009 | Placed on REV. & TAX. suspense file. | |||
04/14/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. Set for hearing May 13. | |||
04/13/2009 | Hearing postponed by committee. | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 22. | |||
01/29/2009 | To Com. on REV. & TAX. | |||
01/14/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 13. | |||
01/13/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |