|
10/11/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 592, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 38. Noes 1. Page 2287.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 78. Noes 0. Page 2884.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/14/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 14. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 1.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 37. Noes 0. Page 895.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From Special Consent Calendar. Placed on third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 481.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
03/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|