02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/18/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/08/2009 | Set for hearing May 18. | |||
05/04/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/30/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 679.) | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 27. | |||
04/01/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 5. Noes 1. Page 397.) Re-referred to Com. on EQ. | |||
03/16/2009 | Set for hearing April 1. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Coms. on ED. and EQ. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |