|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 3038.) Re-referred to Coms. on HEALTH and APPR. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
06/11/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 9.)
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Com. on HEALTH.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 35. Noes 0. Page 797.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
04/17/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 556.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/19/2009
|
Set for hearing April 1.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|