|
09/27/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 302, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Urgency clause adopted. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 33. Noes 1. Page 5035.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading. Consent granted to take up without reference to file. Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 1. Page 6848.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/27/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on August 25.)
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 6608.)
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. On JUD. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 6370.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/17/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file.
|
|
|
|
08/16/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Evans.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading. Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 15. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/16/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. with recommendation: To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on June 16.)
|
|
|
|
06/02/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 930.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 587.)
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/17/2009
|
Set for hearing March 31.
|
|
|
|
12/02/2008
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after January 1.
|
|
|
|
12/01/2008
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|