09/10/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/30/2009 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
06/18/2009 | To Com. on PUB. S. | |||
06/03/2009 | In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk. | |||
06/03/2009 | Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1189.) To Assembly. | |||
06/01/2009 | To Special Consent Calendar. | |||
05/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 12. Noes 0. Page 1067.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/11/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/28/2009 | Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/27/2009 | From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 587.) | |||
04/03/2009 | Set for hearing April 21. | |||
01/14/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after February 13. | |||
01/13/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |