02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/12/2010 | Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author. | |||
01/08/2010 | Set for hearing January 12. | |||
01/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on T. & H. | |||
01/05/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on RLS. | |||
02/27/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28. | |||
02/26/2009 | Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |