LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB503
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB503
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB503
Compare Versions
SB503 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB503 Amended June 23, 2010
SB503 Amended January 12, 2010
SB503 Amended June 1, 2009
SB503 Amended April 20, 2009
SB503 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB503 Enrolled August 27, 2010
SB503 Amended June 23, 2010
SB503 Amended January 12, 2010
SB503 Amended June 1, 2009
SB503 Amended April 20, 2009
SB503 Introduced February 26, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare