|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 25. Noes 14. Page 2281.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 2862.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on NAT. RES. (Heard in committee on July 1.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and NAT. RES.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 15. Page 1191.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1072.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 679.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing April 27.
|
|
|
|
04/21/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on EQ.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on EQ. (Ayes 3. Noes 2. Page 498.)
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 15.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and EQ.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|