LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB51
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB51
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB51
Compare Versions
SB51 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB51 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB51 Amended August 20, 2010
SB51 Amended July 1, 2010
SB51 Amended June 21, 2010
SB51 Amended June 22, 2009
SB51 Amended June 2, 2009
SB51 Amended May 4, 2009
SB51 Amended April 20, 2009
SB51 Introduced January 13, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB51 Chaptered September 27, 2010
SB51 Enrolled September 2, 2010
SB51 Amended August 20, 2010
SB51 Amended July 1, 2010
SB51 Amended June 21, 2010
SB51 Amended June 22, 2009
SB51 Amended June 2, 2009
SB51 Amended May 4, 2009
SB51 Amended April 20, 2009
SB51 Introduced January 13, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare