|
08/06/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 53, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
07/27/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 0. Page 1663.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
07/02/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 72. Noes 0. Page 2237.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 17.)
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
To Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 898.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 727.)
|
|
|
|
04/27/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED. (Corrected April 29.)
|
|
|
|
04/01/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|