|
09/27/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
09/25/2010
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 4 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/26/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 13. Page 4920.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/24/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 55. Noes 18. Page 6536.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 12. Noes 5.) (Heard in committee on August 4.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 1.) (Heard in committee on June 28.)
|
|
|
|
06/15/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Ayes 4. Noes 2.) Re-referred to Com. on REV. & TAX. (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/24/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on HUM. S.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Coms. on REV. & TAX. and HUM. S. Re-referred to Coms. on HUM. S. and REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 24. Noes 14. Page 1112.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1072.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 2. Page 638.)
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 22.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on REV. & TAX.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|