|
10/23/2009
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 636, Statutes of 2009.
|
|
|
|
10/23/2009
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
10/15/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11:30 a.m.
|
|
|
|
10/14/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 2517.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Senate refuses to concur in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 24. Noes 2. Page 2393.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Florez. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2393.)
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 76. Noes 0. Page 3065.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/09/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 18. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Urgency clause adopted. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 2. Page 1095.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/27/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/20/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 8. Noes 1. Page 849.)
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O.
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing May 12.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/27/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|