|
09/30/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 622, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/30/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 2 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 32. Noes 0. Page 4448.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/10/2010
|
Set for hearing August 10. From committee: That the Assembly amendments be concurred in. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 4437.)
|
|
|
|
08/09/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on T. & H. pursuant to Senate Rule 29.10. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 4391.) Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6054.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
06/30/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30).
|
|
|
|
06/21/2010
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
06/17/2010
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in Committee on June 15.)
|
|
|
|
06/07/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2010
|
From committee: Be re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on E.S. & T.M. (Heard in committee on May 28.)
|
|
|
|
05/20/2010
|
Re-referred to Com. on RULES.
|
|
|
|
05/17/2010
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2010
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
01/28/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 21. Noes 12. Page 2735.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
01/25/2010
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
01/21/2010
|
From inactive file to second reading file. Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 19. Noes 18. Page 1197.) Motion to reconsider made by Senator Lowenthal. Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1197.) Placed on inactive file on request of Senator Lowenthal.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 1036.) Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 5. Page 1072.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
Set for hearing May 26.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/05/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 5. Noes 3. Page 727.)
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing April 29.
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on ED. (Ayes 6. Noes 4. Page 610.) Re-referred to Com. on ED. From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on ED.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/26/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 14.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on T. & H. and ED.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|