|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 73. Noes 2. Page 3205.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 5. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on September 3.)
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Page 2924.) Re-referred to Com. On P.E.,R. & S.S. pursuant to Assembly Rule 77.2. Joint Rule 62(a) file notice suspended. (Page 2949.)
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 17. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 6. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 8.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S. Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/15/2009
|
To Com. on P.E.,R. & S.S.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 0. Page 1099.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 1072.) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
04/24/2009
|
Set for hearing May 4.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 557.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 20.
|
|
|
|
04/13/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
04/03/2009
|
Set for hearing April 13.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on P.E. & R.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 28.
|
|
|
|
02/26/2009
|
Introduced. Read first time. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|