|
08/23/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 170, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
08/11/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 11 a.m.
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
In Senate. To enrollment. ( Enrolled measure version corrected August 9.)
|
|
|
|
08/05/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 71. Noes 0. Page 6055.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/02/2010
|
Read second time. To Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
07/01/2010
|
From committee: Do pass. To Consent Calendar. (Ayes 9. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
07/01/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/14/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 36. Noes 1. Page 896.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/11/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/07/2009
|
Withdrawn from committee. Placed on second reading file.
|
|
|
|
05/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 4. Noes 0. Page 809.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on L. GOV.
|
|
|
|
03/16/2009
|
Set for hearing May 6.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Coms. on L. GOV. and APPR.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|