|
08/27/2009
|
Set, second hearing. Held in committee and under submission.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 5.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/18/2009
|
To Com. on U. & C.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 30. Noes 8. Page 1170.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 8. Noes 4. Page 1072.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.)
|
|
|
|
05/18/2009
|
Placed on APPR suspense file.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/28/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 1. Page 583.)
|
|
|
|
04/02/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on E., U., & C.
|
|
|
|
03/25/2009
|
Set for hearing April 21.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on E., U. & C.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|