|
09/29/2010
|
Chaptered by Secretary of State. Chapter 503, Statutes of 2010.
|
|
|
|
09/29/2010
|
Approved by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2010
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 3:30 p.m.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 23. Noes 14. Page 5039.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
08/30/2010
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 49. Noes 28. Page 6839.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
08/23/2010
|
Assembly Rule 69(d) suspended. (Page 6463.)
|
|
|
|
08/20/2010
|
From inactive file to third reading file. Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 49. Noes 26. Page 6443.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2010
|
Notice of motion to remove from inactive file given by Assembly Member Charles Calderon.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Placed on inactive file on request of Assembly Member Torrico.
|
|
|
|
09/03/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To second reading.
|
|
|
|
07/06/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3.) (Heard in committee on June 30.)
|
|
|
|
06/25/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/22/2009
|
To Com. on JUD.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
06/03/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 22. Noes 12. Page 1182.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
06/01/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 7. Noes 3. Page 1072.) Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/22/2009
|
Set for hearing May 28.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
Re-referred to Com. on RLS. Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended. (Ayes 3. Noes 0. Page 808.)
|
|
|
|
04/23/2009
|
Set for hearing May 5.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|