|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/28/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
In Senate. Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 34. Noes 2. Page 2430.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/11/2009
|
Reconsideration granted. (Ayes 58. Noes 6. Page 3358.) Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 57. Noes 8. Page 3370.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
09/10/2009
|
Motion to reconsider continued to next legislative day.
|
|
|
|
09/09/2009
|
Read third time. Refused passage. (Ayes 37. Noes 14. Page 3232.) Motion to reconsider made by Assembly Member Eng.
|
|
|
|
09/04/2009
|
Read third time. Amended. (Ayes 43. Noes 28. Page 3041.) To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/31/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 4.) (Heard in committee on August 27.) (Received by Desk on August 28 pursuant to Joint Rule 61(a)(11).) Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
08/19/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Referred to APPR. suspense file.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 10. Noes 0.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Heard in committee on July 6.)
|
|
|
|
06/30/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
06/29/2009
|
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
|
|
|
|
06/23/2009
|
Hearing postponed by committee.
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on TRANS.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 38. Noes 0. Page 1003.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/13/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
05/12/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 13. Noes 0. Page 848.)
|
|
|
|
05/01/2009
|
Set for hearing May 11.
|
|
|
|
04/29/2009
|
From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 9. Noes 0. Page 708.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
04/20/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
04/16/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/12/2009
|
To Com. on T. & H.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|