02/01/2010 | Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56. | |||
01/07/2010 | Re-referred to Com. on V.A. | |||
01/06/2010 | Withdrawn from committee. Re-referred to Com. on RLS. | |||
01/04/2010 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
05/28/2009 | Set, first hearing. Held in committee and under submission. | |||
05/22/2009 | Set for hearing May 28. (Suspense - for vote only.) | |||
05/11/2009 | Placed on APPR suspense file. | |||
05/01/2009 | Set for hearing May 11. | |||
04/28/2009 | From committee: Do pass, but first be re-referred to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 11. Noes 0. Page 681.) Re-referred to Com. on APPR. | |||
04/22/2009 | From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on G.O. | |||
03/27/2009 | Set for hearing April 28. | |||
03/12/2009 | To Com. on G.O. | |||
03/02/2009 | Read first time. | |||
02/28/2009 | From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30. | |||
02/27/2009 | Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print. |