LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB554
Action History
CA
California Senate Bill SB554
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB554
Action History
02/01/2010
Returned to Secretary of Senate pursuant to Joint Rule 56.
05/04/2009
Set, first hearing. Hearing canceled at the request of author.
04/28/2009
Set for hearing May 4.
03/12/2009
To Com. on EQ.
03/02/2009
Read first time.
02/28/2009
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
02/27/2009
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.