LegiPlex
AI Workspace & Legislation Tracker
New Workspace
About
Sign Up
Login
Research Tools
Keyword Search
Bill Content
Videos & Transcripts
Capitol Directory
US
California CA
Legislatures
2009-2010 Regular Session
Senate
Bills
SB556
Compare Versions
CA
California Senate Bill SB556
Overview
Authors & Sponsors
Activity Timeline
Action History
Meeting Schedule
Draft Versions & Texts
Latest Draft
Compare Versions
Committee Assignments
California 2009-2010 Regular Session
California Senate Bill SB556
Compare Versions
SB556 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB556 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB556 Amended July 7, 2009
SB556 Amended June 26, 2009
SB556 Amended May 28, 2009
SB556 Amended April 15, 2009
SB556 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 1 (Old)
SB556 Chaptered October 11, 2009
SB556 Enrolled September 10, 2009
SB556 Amended July 7, 2009
SB556 Amended June 26, 2009
SB556 Amended May 28, 2009
SB556 Amended April 15, 2009
SB556 Introduced February 27, 2009
Version 2 (New)
Compare