|
01/19/2010
|
Stricken from Senate file.
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business. (Veto)
|
|
|
|
10/11/2009
|
Vetoed by Governor.
|
|
|
|
09/25/2009
|
Enrolled. To Governor at 1 p.m.
|
|
|
|
09/08/2009
|
Senate concurs in Assembly amendments. (Ayes 40. Noes 0. Page 2275.) To enrollment.
|
|
|
|
09/02/2009
|
In Senate. To unfinished business.
|
|
|
|
09/01/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 77. Noes 1. Page 2854.) To Senate.
|
|
|
|
07/16/2009
|
Read second time. To third reading.
|
|
|
|
07/15/2009
|
From committee: Do pass. (Ayes 16. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on July 15.)
|
|
|
|
07/08/2009
|
Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on APPR.
|
|
|
|
07/07/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0.) (Heard in committee on June 23.)
|
|
|
|
06/08/2009
|
To Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
In Assembly. Read first time. Held at Desk.
|
|
|
|
05/26/2009
|
Read third time. Passed. (Ayes 39. Noes 0. Page 1012.) To Assembly.
|
|
|
|
05/21/2009
|
To Special Consent Calendar.
|
|
|
|
05/19/2009
|
From committee: Be placed on second reading file pursuant to Senate Rule 28.8.
|
|
|
|
05/08/2009
|
Set for hearing May 18.
|
|
|
|
05/04/2009
|
From committee: Do pass as amended, but first amend, and re-refer to Com. on APPR. (Ayes 7. Noes 0. Page 705.)
|
|
|
|
04/22/2009
|
From committee with author's amendments. Read second time. Amended. Re-referred to Com. on PUB. S.
|
|
|
|
04/14/2009
|
Set for hearing April 28.
|
|
|
|
03/02/2009
|
Read first time.
|
|
|
|
02/28/2009
|
From print. May be acted upon on or after March 30.
|
|
|
|
02/27/2009
|
Introduced. To Com. on RLS. for assignment. To print.
|
|
|